WI AB740 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-7)
Status: Failed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 342.14 (3) of the statutes; Relating to: the certificate of title for a vehicle that is transferred to a spouse upon the death of the owner. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The certificate of title for a vehicle that is transferred to a spouse upon the death of the owner. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29HouseFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2018-03-21HouseReferred to calendar of 3-22-2018 pursuant to Assembly Rule 93
2018-02-14HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2018-02-14HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Family Law, Ayes 7, Noes 0
2018-02-14HouseReport Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Family Law, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2018-02-01HouseExecutive action taken
2018-01-30HousePublic hearing held
2018-01-22HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Pope
2018-01-09HouseFiscal estimate received
2017-12-13HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Family Law
2017-12-13HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback