WI AB736 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 59.69 (5) (a), 59.69 (5) (b) and 59.692 (1c); and to create 59.692 (2) (bg) and 992.23 of the statutes; Relating to: town zoning in shorelands, the scope of county shoreland zoning ordinances, and authorizing partial county zoning. (FE)
Title
Town zoning in shorelands, the scope of county shoreland zoning ordinances, and authorizing partial county zoning. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Swearingen [R] | Rep. John Spiros [R] | Sen. Mark Spreitzer [D] | Sen. Jerry Petrowski [R] |
Sen. Janet Bewley [D] | Sen. Luther Olsen [R] | Sen. Andre Jacque [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Published 3-4-2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-3-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 145 |
2020-02-28 | House | Presented to the Governor on 2-28-2020 by directive of the Speaker |
2020-02-25 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-25-2020 |
2020-02-20 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a second time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Senate Organization and take up |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-18 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-01-23 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-01-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-09 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government |
2020-01-09 | House | Introduced |