WI AB733 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 45.44 (3) (intro.) and 440.05 (intro.); and to create 440.052 of the statutes; Relating to: fee waivers for certain occupational credentials. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fee waivers for certain occupational credentials. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-17HousePublished 4-17-2018
2018-04-17HouseReport approved by the Governor on 4-16-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 319
2018-04-12HousePresented to the Governor on 4-12-2018
2018-03-26HouseReport correctly enrolled on 3-26-2018
2018-03-21HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2018-03-20SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2018-03-20SenateRead a third time and concurred in, Ayes 32, Noes 0
2018-03-20SenateRules suspended
2018-03-20SenateOrdered to a third reading
2018-03-20SenateRead a second time
2018-03-15SenatePlaced on calendar 3-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2018-03-15SenatePublic hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
2018-03-15SenateWithdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2
2018-03-15SenateReferred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2
2018-03-12SenateAvailable for scheduling
2018-03-12SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2018-02-21SenateReceived from Assembly
2018-02-20HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2018-02-20HouseRepresentative Barca added as a coauthor
2018-02-20HouseRead a third time and passed
2018-02-20HouseRules suspended
2018-02-20HouseOrdered to a third reading
2018-02-20HouseAssembly Amendment 3 withdrawn and returned to author
2018-02-20HouseAssembly Amendment 2 adopted
2018-02-20HouseRead a second time
2018-02-15HouseMade a special order of business at 1:39 PM on 2-20-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 26
2018-02-15HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2018-02-15HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 9, Noes 0
2018-02-15HouseReport Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 9, Noes 0
2018-02-09HouseAssembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Novak
2018-02-01HouseExecutive action taken
2018-01-30HouseAssembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Novak
2018-01-18HousePublic hearing held
2018-01-11HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Novak
2017-12-15HouseFiscal estimate received
2017-12-14HouseFiscal estimate received
2017-12-07HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform
2017-12-07HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback