WI AB731 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 985.03 (1) (a) 1. and 985.03 (1) (a) 2.; to renumber and amend 985.03 (1) (c); to amend 985.01 (5), 985.02 (1), 985.03 (1) (a) (intro.) and 985.03 (2); and to create 985.01 (1b), 985.01 (3g), 985.03 (1) (a) 1m., 985.03 (1) (a) 2m., 985.03 (1) (a) 3., 985.03 (1) (am) and 985.03 (1) (cm) of the statutes; Relating to: qualification of newspapers to receive compensation for publication of legal notice.
Title
Qualification of newspapers to receive compensation for publication of legal notice.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Published 4-17-2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 282 |
2018-04-12 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-12-2018 |
2018-03-23 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-23-2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-20 | House | Representative Barca added as a coauthor |
2018-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2018-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-15 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:37 PM on 2-20-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 26 |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-01-24 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Rural Development and Mining, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2018-01-18 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-01-04 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-12-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Rural Development and Mining |
2017-12-07 | House | Introduced |