WI AB730 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.235 (1) (fr) and 39.51 of the statutes; Relating to: student loan reimbursements for certain individuals domiciled in rural counties, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Student loan reimbursements for certain individuals domiciled in rural counties, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-01-24 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Rural Development and Mining, Ayes 8, Noes 4 |
2018-01-18 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-01-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Vruwink |
2018-01-12 | House | Senator Testin added as a cosponsor |
2018-01-04 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-12-27 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-12-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Rural Development and Mining |
2017-12-07 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab730 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB730.pdf |