WI AB73 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-4)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-4)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 97.26 of the statutes; Relating to: labeling food as a type of dairy product or as a dairy ingredient and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Labeling food as a type of dairy product or as a dairy ingredient and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2021-06-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-06-22 | House | Representative Spreitzer added as a coauthor |
2021-06-22 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2021-06-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-06-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-06-22 | House | Read a second time |
2021-06-16 | House | Placed on calendar 6-22-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-05-14 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-05-14 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2021-04-28 | House | Representative Dallman added as a coauthor |
2021-04-07 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-04-02 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Considine, L. Myers, Shankland, Spreitzer and Vruwink |
2021-03-10 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-03-09 | House | Representatives Ramthun and Kitchens added as coauthors |
2021-02-24 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-02-22 | House | Representatives Plumer and Edming added as coauthors |
2021-02-18 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduced |