WI AB73 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-7)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - Published 11-21-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 77.707 (1), 229.68 (intro.) and 229.685 (2); and to create 229.682 (9) of the statutes; Relating to: lease terms and the imposition of sales and use taxes related to a local professional baseball park district. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lease terms and the imposition of sales and use taxes related to a local professional baseball park district. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-05 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 2 rejected (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-20HousePublished 11-21-2019
2019-11-20HouseReport approved by the Governor on 11-20-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 28
2019-11-14HousePresented to the Governor on 11-14-2019 by directive of the Speaker
2019-11-13HouseReport correctly enrolled on 11-13-2019
2019-11-06HouseLRB correction (Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1)
2019-11-06HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2019-11-05SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2019-11-05SenateRead a third time and concurred in, Ayes 33, Noes 0
2019-11-05SenateRules suspended
2019-11-05SenateOrdered to a third reading
2019-11-05SenateSenate Amendment 2 rejected, Ayes 19, Noes 14
2019-11-05SenateSenate Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 19, Noes 14
2019-11-05SenateRead a second time
2019-11-05SenateSenate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Carpenter
2019-11-05SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Carpenter
2019-11-01SenatePlaced on calendar 11-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2019-11-01SenatePublic hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
2019-11-01SenateWithdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2
2019-11-01SenateReferred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2
2019-06-24SenateAvailable for scheduling
2019-06-24SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2019-06-20SenateSenator Craig added as a cosponsor
2019-06-20SenateReceived from Assembly
2019-06-20HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2019-06-20HouseRead a third time and passed
2019-06-20HouseRules suspended
2019-06-20HouseOrdered to a third reading
2019-06-20HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
2019-06-20HouseAssembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
2019-06-20HouseAssembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Wittke
2019-06-20HouseAssembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author
2019-06-20HouseAssembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
2019-06-20HouseRead a second time
2019-06-19HouseAssembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Wittke
2019-06-18HousePlaced on calendar 6-20-2019 by Committee on Rules
2019-06-18HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2019-06-18HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 8, Noes 0
2019-06-18HouseReport Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 8, Noes 0
2019-06-18HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 8, Noes 0
2019-05-28HouseRepresentative Vining added as a coauthor
2019-05-23HouseExecutive action taken
2019-05-23HouseAssembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Wittke
2019-05-22HouseSenator Kooyenga added as a cosponsor
2019-05-21HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Wittke
2019-05-20HouseRepresentative Brostoff added as a coauthor
2019-03-28HousePublic hearing held
2019-03-20HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-03-19HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Wittke
2019-03-07HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-03-07HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback