WI AB73 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-6)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Published 6-2-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-6)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Published 6-2-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 1.10 (4); and to create 1.10 (3) (u) of the statutes; Relating to: designating cheese as the state dairy product.
Title
Designating cheese as the state dairy product.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | House | Published 6-2-2017 |
2017-06-01 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 6-1-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 8 |
2017-05-31 | House | Presented to the Governor on 5-31-2017 |
2017-05-31 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 5-31-2017 |
2017-05-02 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Rules suspended and taken up |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-2-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2017-04-04 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-04-04 | House | Representatives Rohrkaste and Kolste added as coauthors |
2017-04-04 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 96, Noes 0 |
2017-04-04 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-04-04 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-04-04 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author |
2017-04-04 | House | Read a second time |
2017-04-04 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2017-04-03 | House | Representative Spreitzer added as a coauthor |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on calendar 4-4-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-03-29 | House | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor |
2017-03-29 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Jacque |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-03-29 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2017-03-23 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-03-23 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-02-17 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2017-02-17 | House | Introduced |