WI AB723 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 304.063 (1) (a); and to create 304.063 (1) (ab) and 304.063 (5) of the statutes; Relating to: notice to the public upon release of a violent offender. (FE)
Title
Notice to the public upon release of a violent offender. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-29 | House | Representative Loudenbeck added as a coauthor |
2020-01-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Corrections |
2020-01-08 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab723 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB723.pdf |