WI AB721 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 118.40 (2r) (cq) of the statutes; Relating to: the number of independent charter schools authorized by the College of Menominee Nation or the Lac Courte Oreilles Ojibwa Community College. (FE)
Title
The number of independent charter schools authorized by the College of Menominee Nation or the Lac Courte Oreilles Ojibwa Community College. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-23 | House | Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor |
2022-02-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 8:44 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-01 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 9, Noes 4 |
2022-01-24 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Steffen |
2022-01-18 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-01-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Mursau |
2022-01-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Mursau |
2021-12-21 | House | Representative Macco added as a coauthor |
2021-12-14 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-11-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-11-19 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2021-11-19 | House | Introduced |