WI AB720 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 69.18 (4) (bm), 979.01 (3), 979.01 (3m), 979.03 and 979.10 (3); to renumber 69.18 (4) (a) 1g. to 6.; to renumber and amend 69.18 (4) (a) (intro.), 157.02 (1), (2), (3), (4) and (5), 979.01 (1m), 979.01 (2), 979.01 (4), 979.02, 979.10 (1) (a) 1., 2. and 3. and 979.10 (1) (c); to amend 69.01 (12), 69.18 (1) (a) 3., 69.18 (2) (d) 1., 69.18 (2) (d) 2., 69.18 (2) (d) 3., 69.18 (3) (a), 69.18 (3) (b), 69.18 (3) (d), 69.20 (2) (a) 2., 157.03 (1), 157.03 (2), 157.055 (2) (intro.), 157.112 (3) (intro.), 157.70 (3) (a), 346.71 (1), 346.71 (2), 440.78 (1) (b), 979.01 (title), 979.01 (1r), 979.015, 979.02 (title), 979.025 (title), 979.025 (1), 979.025 (2), 979.025 (3), 979.09, 979.10 (1) (a) (intro.), 979.10 (1) (b), 979.10 (2), 979.10 (4) and 979.22; to repeal and recreate 979.01 (1) and 979.01 (1g); and to create 51.30 (4) (b) 29., 69.18 (4) (am) (intro.), 69.18 (4) (b), 69.18 (4) (d), 69.18 (4) (e), 69.18 (4) (f), 157.02 (1m) (title), 157.02 (2m), 979.001, 979.01 (1d), 979.01 (1i), 979.01 (1k), 979.01 (1m) (b), 979.01 (1p), 979.01 (2) (b), 979.017, 979.02 (2) to (7), 979.027, 979.032, 979.034, 979.036, 979.10 (1) (a) 1m. and 2m., 979.10 (1) (d), 979.10 (5) and 979.10 (6) of the statutes; relating to: reporting deaths, death investigations and other duties of coroners and medical examiners, disposition of bodies, and providing a penalty. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reporting deaths, death investigations and other duties of coroners and medical examiners, disposition of bodies, and providing a penalty. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-12HouseFiscal estimate received
2012-04-10HouseFiscal estimate received
2012-04-02HouseFiscal estimate received
2012-03-23HouseFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2012-03-15HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections
2012-03-15HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback