WI AB718 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Senator Larson added as a cosponsor
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 628.34 (5m) of the statutes; Relating to: prohibiting certain practices relating to insurance coverage of clinician-administered drugs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting certain practices relating to insurance coverage of clinician-administered drugs.

Sponsors

Rep. Tony Kurtz [R]Rep. Rob Swearingen [R]Rep. Evan Goyke [D]Rep. Jesse James [R]
Rep. Warren Petryk [R]Rep. Rob Summerfield [R]Rep. Deb Andraca [D]Rep. Samba Baldeh [D]
Rep. Elijah Behnke [R]Rep. Jill Billings [D]Rep. David Bowen [D]Rep. Janel Brandtjen [R]
Rep. Rachael Cabral-Guevara [R]Rep. Calvin Callahan [R]Rep. Sue Conley [D]Rep. Dave Considine [D]
Rep. Barbara Dittrich [R]Rep. Steve Doyle [D]Rep. Dora Drake [D]Rep. Cindi Duchow [R]
Rep. James Edming [R]Rep. Jodi Emerson [D]Rep. Rick Gundrum [R]Rep. Kalan Haywood [D]
Rep. Gordon Hintz [D]Rep. Samantha Kerkman [R]Rep. Joel Kitchens [R]Rep. Dan Knodl [R]
Rep. Scott Krug [R]Rep. John Macco [R]Rep. Gae Magnafici [R]Rep. Beth Meyers [D]
Rep. Nick Milroy [D]Rep. Clint Moses [R]Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R]Rep. LaKeshia Myers [D]
Rep. Greta Neubauer [D]Rep. Todd Novak [R]Rep. Tod Ohnstad [D]Rep. Loren Oldenburg [R]
Rep. Sylvia Ortiz-Velez [D]Rep. Jon Plumer [R]Rep. Sondy Pope [D]Rep. Daniel Riemer [D]
Rep. Jessie Rodriguez [R]Rep. Donna Rozar [R]Rep. Michael Schraa [R]Rep. Katrina Shankland [D]
Rep. Kristina Shelton [D]Rep. Kenneth Skowronski [R]Rep. Lee Snodgrass [D]Rep. Patrick Snyder [R]
Rep. John Spiros [R]Rep. Mark Spreitzer [D]Rep. Jeremy Thiesfeldt [R]Rep. Travis Tranel [R]
Rep. Robyn Vining [D]Rep. Don Vruwink [D]Rep. Chuck Wichgers [R]Rep. Christine Sinicki [D]
Rep. Shelia Stubbs [D]Rep. Ron Tusler [R]Sen. Alberta Darling [R]Sen. Howard Marklein [R]
Sen. Jon Erpenbach [D]Sen. Kathleen Bernier [R]Sen. Janet Bewley [D]Sen. Dan Feyen [R]
Sen. Andre Jacque [R]Sen. LaTonya Johnson [D]Sen. Steve Nass [R]Sen. Jerry Petrowski [R]
Sen. Brad Pfaff [D]Sen. Janis Ringhand [D]Sen. Kelda Roys [D]Sen. Jeff Smith [D]
Sen. Lena Taylor [D]Sen. Robert Wirch [D]Sen. Van Wanggaard [R]Sen. Robert Cowles [R]
Sen. Timothy Carpenter [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-18HouseSenator Larson added as a cosponsor
2022-01-06HouseRepresentative McGuire added as a coauthor
2022-01-06HouseRepresentative Doyle withdrawn as a coauthor
2022-01-03HouseRepresentative Spiros withdrawn as a coauthor
2021-12-06HouseRepresentative Cabral-Guevara withdrawn as a coauthor
2021-12-01HouseSenator Agard added as a cosponsor
2021-11-17HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Health
2021-11-17HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback