WI AB717 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-5)
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Published 3-8-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-5)
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Published 3-8-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.26 (3) (L); and to create 71.05 (1) (hp), 71.26 (3) (ag) 4., 71.34 (1k) (ai), 71.45 (1) (dn) and 71.45 (2) (a) 24. of the statutes; Relating to: an income and franchise tax exemption for restaurant revitalization grants. (FE)
Title
An income and franchise tax exemption for restaurant revitalization grants. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Published 3-8-2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-7-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 156 |
2022-03-03 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-3-2022 |
2022-02-25 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-25-2022 |
2022-02-15 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 30, Noes 2 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-15-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 1 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2022-01-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-01-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2022-01-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-01-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-01-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2022-01-20 | House | Read a second time |
2022-01-18 | House | Placed on calendar 1-20-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-01-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-01-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2022-01-18 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2022-01-18 | House | Representatives Cabrera and Drake added as coauthors |
2022-01-12 | House | Representative Considine added as a coauthor |
2021-12-16 | House | Representatives Vining and Shankland added as coauthors |
2021-12-14 | House | Representative Andraca added as a coauthor |
2021-12-08 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-12-06 | House | Representative Haywood added as a coauthor |
2021-12-03 | House | Representative Ohnstad added as a coauthor |
2021-12-02 | House | Representative Conley added as a coauthor |
2021-12-01 | House | Representative Hong added as a coauthor |
2021-11-30 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-11-29 | House | Representative Shelton added as a coauthor |
2021-11-29 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Wittke |
2021-11-24 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-11-17 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-11-17 | House | Introduced |