WI AB716 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 100.2095 (4) and 100.2095 (5); to renumber and amend 100.2095 (1), 100.2095 (2) (a) and (b) and 100.2095 (3); to amend 100.2095 (6) (a), 100.2095 (6) (b), 100.2095 (6) (c) and 100.2095 (6) (d); and to create 100.2095 (1) (b), 100.2095 (1) (c), 100.2095 (1) (d), 100.2095 (1) (e), 100.2095 (2) (title), 100.2095 (2m), 100.2095 (6) (title), 100.2095 (6) (cg) and 100.2095 (6) (cr) of the statutes; relating to: children's bedding containing certain chemicals and providing penalties. (FE)
Title
Children's bedding containing certain chemicals and providing penalties. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-04-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2012-03-16 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-03-15 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Children and Families |
2012-03-15 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab716 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AB716.pdf |