WI AB710 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-11 - Published 4-12-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-11 - Published 4-12-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 165.785 (1); to amend 165.785 (2); and to create 165.785 (1) (b) 2., 165.785 (2m) and 175.51 of the statutes; Relating to: alerts for missing adults at risk and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Alerts for missing adults at risk and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-11 | House | Published 4-12-2014 |
2014-04-11 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-11-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 264 |
2014-04-10 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-10-2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 4-8-2014 |
2014-04-02 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 33, Noes 0 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senator Lassa added as a cosponsor |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senator Hansen added as a cosponsor |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senator Vinehout added as a cosponsor |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-1-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Labor, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Labor |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2014-02-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-13 | House | Representative Barca added as a coauthor |
2014-02-13 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 97, Noes 0 |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-02-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2014-02-13 | House | Read a second time |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2014-02-11 | House | Placed on calendar 2-13-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-02-11 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2014-02-11 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2014-02-11 | House | Executive action taken |
2014-02-07 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Weininger |
2014-02-05 | House | Public hearing held |
2014-02-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-02-04 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Weininger |
2014-01-31 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Aging and Long-Term Care |
2014-01-31 | House | Introduced |