WI AB707 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 893.33 (6m); and to create 893.33 (6m) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: creating an exception to the 40-year recording requirement for recorded access easements.
Title
Creating an exception to the 40-year recording requirement for recorded access easements.
Sponsors
Rep. David Murphy [R] | Rep. Scott Allen [R] | Rep. Cody Horlacher [R] | Rep. Clint Moses [R] |
Rep. Timothy Ramthun [R] | Sen. Andre Jacque [R] | Sen. Duey Stroebel [R] | Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-24 | House | Representative Spreitzer added as a coauthor |
2022-02-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 8:42 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Murphy |
2022-02-08 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Murphy |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-01 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2022-01-18 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-01-18 | House | Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor |
2022-01-12 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-11-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government |
2021-11-12 | House | Introduced |