WI AB707 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 813.12 (4) (c) 1., 813.12 (4) (c) 2., 813.122 (5) (d) 1., 813.122 (5) (d) 2., 813.122 (5) (d) 3., 813.123 (5) (c) 1., 813.123 (5) (c) 2., 813.123 (5) (c) 3. and 813.125 (4) (c); and to create 813.12 (4) (d), 813.122 (5) (dm), 813.123 (5) (d) and 813.125 (4) (d) of the statutes; Relating to: extending the time certain injunctions remain in effect. (FE)
Title
Extending the time certain injunctions remain in effect. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | House | Published 4-17-2014 |
2014-04-16 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 311 |
2014-04-15 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-15-2014 |
2014-03-31 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-31-2014 |
2014-03-18 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-18-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2014-02-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-13 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-02-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2014-02-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives J. Ott and Rodriguez |
2014-02-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2014-02-13 | House | Read a second time |
2014-02-11 | House | Placed on calendar 2-13-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-02-11 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 8, Noes 1 |
2014-02-11 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2014-02-11 | House | Executive action taken |
2014-02-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Goyke |
2014-02-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2014-01-31 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-01-31 | House | Introduced |