WI AB703 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-18 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-18 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 48.02 (1d), 48.02 (2), 48.366 (8), subchapter IX (title) of chapter 48 [precedes 48.44], 48.44 (title), 48.44 (1), 48.45 (1) (a), 48.45 (1) (am), 48.45 (3), 118.163 (4), 125.07 (4) (d), 125.07 (4) (e) 1., 125.085 (3) (bt), 165.83 (1) (c) 1., 165.83 (1) (c) 2., 301.12 (2m), 301.12 (14) (a), 301.26 (4) (cm) 2., 302.31 (7), 938.02 (1), 938.02 (10m), 938.12 (2), 938.18 (2), 938.183 (3), 938.255 (1) (intro.), 938.34 (8), 938.343 (2), 938.344 (3), 938.35 (1m), 938.355 (4) (b), 938.355 (4m) (a), 938.39, subchapter IX (title) of chapter 938 [precedes 938.44], 938.44, 938.45 (1) (a), 938.45 (3), 938.48 (4m) (title), 938.48 (4m) (a), 938.48 (4m) (b), 938.48 (14), 938.57 (3) (title), 938.57 (3) (a) (intro.), 938.57 (3) (a) 1., 938.57 (3) (a) 3., 938.57 (3) (b), 946.50 (intro.), 948.01 (1), 948.11 (2) (am) (intro.), 948.45 (1), 948.60 (2) (d), 948.61 (4), 961.455 (title), 961.455 (1), 961.455 (2), 961.46, 961.573 (2), 961.574 (2), 961.575 (1), 961.575 (2), 961.575 (3), 990.01 (3) and 990.01 (20) of the statutes; relating to: the age at which a person who is alleged to have violated a criminal law, a civil law, or a municipal ordinance and who has not previously been adjudicated delinquent is subject to circuit court or municipal court rather than juvenile court jurisdiction. (FE)
Title
The age at which a person who is alleged to have violated a criminal law, a civil law, or a municipal ordinance and who has not previously been adjudicated delinquent is subject to circuit court or municipal court rather than juvenile court jurisdiction. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Frederick Kessler [D] | Rep. Steve Doyle [D] | Rep. Sandra Pasch [D] | Rep. Tamara Grigsby [D] |
Sen. Lena Taylor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-04-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2012-03-15 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2012-03-15 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab703 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AB703.pdf |