WI AB702 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-8)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-8)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 45.20 (2) (b) 1. b.; to amend 45.20 (2) (d) 1. (intro.); and to create 45.20 (2) (d) 1m. of the statutes; relating to: the veterans tuition reimbursement program.
Title
The veterans tuition reimbursement program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-12 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-04-12 | Report passage recommended by committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 9, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-07 | Executive action taken | |
2010-03-25 | Public hearing held | |
2010-03-02 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-02-25 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-02-05 | Read first time and referred to committee on Veterans and Military Affairs | |
2010-02-05 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab702 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB702.pdf |