WI AB70 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Representatives Wichgers and Gustafson added as coauthors
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Representatives Wichgers and Gustafson added as coauthors
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 947.065 of the statutes; Relating to: participation in a riot and providing a penalty.
Title
Participation in a riot and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-22 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 62 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Senate | Representatives Wichgers and Gustafson added as coauthors |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2023-03-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-03-22 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 62, Noes 35 |
2023-03-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-03-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-03-22 | House | Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor |
2023-03-22 | House | Read a second time |
2023-03-21 | House | Representatives Knodl and Gundrum added as coauthors |
2023-03-14 | House | Placed on calendar 3-22-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-03-13 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2023-03-13 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 5, Noes 2 |
2023-03-07 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-03-02 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-02-27 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-02-27 | House | Introduced |