WI AB70 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 940.09 (1c) (a) and 940.09 (1c) (b); and to create 940.09 (1c) (a) 2. and 940.09 (1c) (b) 2. of the statutes; Relating to: mandatory period of confinement for homicide by intoxicated use of a vehicle and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Mandatory period of confinement for homicide by intoxicated use of a vehicle and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Ott [R] | Rep. Jeff Stone [R] | Sen. Steve Nass [R] | Rep. Garey Bies [R] |
Rep. Tom Larson [R] | Sen. Alberta Darling [R] | Sen. Joe Leibham [R] | Sen. Timothy Carpenter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2013-11-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-11-25 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2013-09-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-09-11 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Hebl |
2013-08-01 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-05-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-04-01 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-03-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-03-14 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-03-14 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab70 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB70.pdf |