WI AB7 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 46-6)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 46-6)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 40.51 (15m) and 632.86; to renumber 632.865 (1) (a); to renumber and amend 632.865 (1) (c) and 633.01 (4); to amend 40.51 (8), 40.51 (8m), 66.0137 (4), 120.13 (2) (g), 185.983 (1) (intro.), 450.135 (9), 601.31 (1) (w), 601.46 (3) (b), 609.83, 616.09 (1) (a) 2., chapter 633 (title), 633.01 (1) (intro.) and (c), 633.01 (3), 633.01 (5), 633.04 (intro.), 633.05, 633.06, 633.07, 633.09 (4) (b) 2. and 3., 633.11, 633.12 (1) (intro.), (b) and (c), 633.13 (1) and (3), 633.14 (2) (intro.) and (c) 1. and 3. and (3), 633.15 (1) (a), (1m), and (2) (a) 1., 2. and 3. and (b) 1., 633.15 (2) (b) 2. and 633.16; and to create 450.13 (5m), 450.135 (8m), 632.861, 632.865 (1) (ae) and (ak), 632.865 (1) (c) 2., 632.865 (1) (dm), 632.865 (3) to (7), 633.01 (2r), 633.01 (4g), 633.01 (4r), 633.01 (6), 633.15 (2) (b) 1. d. and 633.15 (2) (f) of the statutes; Relating to: pharmacy benefit managers, prescription drug benefits, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Pharmacy benefit managers, prescription drug benefits, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-03-16 | House | Representative Hesselbein added as a coauthor |
2021-03-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-03-15 | House | Representatives Doyle, Conley, Emerson, B. Meyers, Considine, Subeck and Allen added as coauthors |
2021-03-12 | House | Representatives Hintz, Spreitzer, Pope, Shankland, Sinicki, Goyke, Billings, Hebl, Andraca, Ohnstad, Brostoff, Baldeh, S. Rodriguez and Vining added as coauthors |
2021-03-11 | House | Placed on calendar 3-16-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-03-11 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2021-03-11 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2021-02-11 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-02-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Schraa |
2021-02-10 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-02-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Schraa |
2021-02-09 | House | Representative Dallman added as a coauthor |
2021-02-05 | House | Senator Bewley added as a cosponsor |
2021-02-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-01-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-01-28 | House | Commissioner of Insurance report received pursuant to s.601.423(2), Wisconsin Statutes |
2021-01-26 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-01-25 | House | Senator Johnson added as a cosponsor |
2021-01-22 | House | Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor |
2021-01-21 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduced |