WI AB7 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-11 - Published 11-12-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-11 - Published 11-12-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 939.66 (2) of the statutes; Relating to: lesser included homicide crimes.
Title
Lesser included homicide crimes.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Ott [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-11 | House | Published 11-12-2015 |
2015-11-11 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 11-11-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 81 |
2015-11-10 | House | Presented to the Governor on 11-10-2015 |
2015-10-22 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 10-22-2015 |
2015-10-20 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-10-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-20-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2015-04-14 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-04-14 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2015-04-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-04-14 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-04-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2015-04-14 | House | Read a second time |
2015-04-09 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1) |
2015-04-09 | House | Placed on calendar 4-14-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-04-09 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-04-09 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2015-04-09 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2015-04-09 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-04-02 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative J. Ott |
2015-04-07 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-01-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-07 | House | Introduced |