WI AB7 | 2011 | January Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-08 - Published 2-18-2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-08 - Published 2-18-2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.05 (6) (a) 15., 71.21 (4), 71.26 (2) (a) 4., 71.34 (1k) (g), 71.45 (2) (a) 10. and 77.92 (4); and to create 71.07 (5p), 71.10 (4) (dw), 71.28 (5p), 71.30 (3) (dw), 71.47 (5p) and 71.49 (1) (dw) of the statutes; relating to: an income and franchise tax credit for small businesses. (FE)
Title
An income and franchise tax credit for small businesses. (FE)
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 60 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 6 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 61 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 5 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 58 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - Assembly: Assembly substitute amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 58 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - Assembly: Assembly substitute amendment 5 laid on table (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 60 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 6 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 61 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 5 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 58 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - Assembly: Assembly substitute amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 58 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - Assembly: Assembly substitute amendment 5 laid on table (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | Published 2-18-2011 | |
2011-02-04 | Report approved by the Governor on 2-4-2011. 2011 Wisconsin Act 5 | |
2011-02-03 | Presented to the Governor on 2-3-2011 | |
2011-01-28 | Report correctly enrolled | |
2011-01-27 | Received from Senate concurred in | |
2011-01-27 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2011-01-27 | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 25, Noes 8 | |
2011-01-27 | Rules suspended | |
2011-01-27 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2011-01-27 | Read a second time | |
2011-01-27 | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Senate Organization and take up | |
2011-01-26 | Available for scheduling | |
2011-01-26 | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization | |
2011-01-26 | Received from Assembly | |
2011-01-25 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2011-01-25 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 60, Noes 33, Paired 2 | |
2011-01-25 | Rules suspended | |
2011-01-25 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2011-01-25 | Assembly substitute amendment 1 adopted | |
2011-01-25 | Assembly amendment 6 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 61, Noes 33 | |
2011-01-25 | Assembly amendment 6 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Radcliffe | |
2011-01-25 | Assembly amendment 5 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 58, Noes 36 | |
2011-01-25 | Assembly amendment 5 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Vruwink | |
2011-01-25 | Assembly substitute amendment 3 laid on table, Ayes 58, Noes 36 | |
2011-01-25 | Assembly substitute amendment 3 offered by Representatives Seidel and Barca | |
2011-01-25 | Assembly substitute amendment 4 withdrawn and returned to author | |
2011-01-25 | Assembly substitute amendment 4 offered by Representative Hintz | |
2011-01-25 | Assembly substitute amendment 5 laid on table, Ayes 59, Noes 36 | |
2011-01-25 | Assembly substitute amendment 5 offered by Representatives Young, E. Coggs and Kessler | |
2011-01-25 | Read a second time | |
2011-01-20 | Placed on calendar 1-25-2011 by committee on Rules | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2011-01-20 | Report passage as amended, with emergency statement attached, pursuant to s. 16.47 (2), Wisconsin Statutes, recommended by joint committee on Finance | |
2011-01-20 | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 4 | |
2011-01-20 | Assembly amendment 4 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by joint committee on Finance | |
2011-01-20 | Assembly amendment 3 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by joint committee on Finance | |
2011-01-20 | Assembly amendment 2 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by joint committee on Finance | |
2011-01-20 | Assembly amendment 1 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by joint committee on Finance | |
2011-01-20 | Assembly substitute amendment 2 offered by joint committee on Finance | |
2011-01-20 | Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by joint committee on Finance | |
2011-01-20 | Executive action taken | |
2011-01-14 | Referred to joint committee on Finance | |
2011-01-14 | Report passage recommended by committee on Jobs, Economy and Small Business, Ayes 9, Noes 6 | |
2011-01-13 | Executive action taken | |
2011-01-11 | Public hearing held | |
2011-01-11 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2011-01-11 | Senator Moulton added as a cosponsor | |
2011-01-11 | Representative Vos added as a coauthor | |
2011-01-11 | Read first time and referred to committee on Jobs, Economy and Small Business | |
2011-01-11 | Introduced |