WI AB699 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 84.10417 of the statutes; Relating to: designating and marking a bridge across the Oconto River in the city of Oconto as the PFC Valentine T. Warrichaiet Memorial Bridge. (FE)
Title
Designating and marking a bridge across the Oconto River in the city of Oconto as the PFC Valentine T. Warrichaiet Memorial Bridge. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Published 4-17-2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 276 |
2018-04-12 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-12-2018 |
2018-03-26 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-26-2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-01-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-01-16 | House | Representative Hesselbein added as a coauthor |
2018-01-16 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2018-01-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-01-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-01-16 | House | Read a second time |
2018-01-11 | House | Placed on calendar 1-16-2018 by Committee on Rules |
2018-01-05 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-01-05 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2017-12-19 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-12-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-12-05 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-12-05 | House | Representatives Kolste and Meyers added as coauthors |
2017-11-29 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-11-29 | House | Introduced |