WI AB698 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 126.01 (20) (a), 126.11 (3) (f), 126.41 (2) (f), 126.44 (1) (c), 126.46 (5m) (a) 1., 126.46 (5m) (a) 2., 126.47 (3) (a) 1., 126.47 (3) (a) 2., 126.56 (3) (f) and 126.88 (1) (c); to renumber 126.41 (9) (a), 126.41 (9) (b) and 126.47 (1) (b) 2.; to renumber and amend 126.41 (9) (intro.), 126.44 (1) (a), 126.44 (1) (b), 126.46 (5m) (a) (intro.), 126.47 (1) (b) 1. (intro.), 126.47 (1) (b) 1. a., 126.47 (1) (b) 1. b., 126.47 (3) (a) (intro.) and 126.48 (3); to consolidate, renumber and amend 126.01 (20) (intro.) and (b); to amend 126.11 (6), 126.11 (9) (intro.), 126.13 (1) (a) 2., 126.13 (1) (b) 2., 126.13 (1) (d), 126.13 (4m), 126.16 (1) (b), 126.16 (1) (c) 1. b., 126.16 (3) (a) (intro.), 126.16 (3) (a) 2., 126.16 (3) (b), 126.26 (5), 126.28 (4m), 126.41 (6) (intro.), 126.44 (1) (d), 126.44 (3), 126.44 (6m), 126.46 (1), 126.47 (3) (b), 126.47 (7) (a) (intro.), 126.47 (7) (am), 126.48 (1), 126.48 (2), 126.56 (9) (intro.), 126.58 (4m) and 126.88 (1) (b); and to create 126.13 (1) (e), 126.16 (3) (am), 126.16 (3) (c), 126.40 (6m), 126.40 (7e) (a) (intro.), 126.40 (7e) (b), 126.41 (6) (ag), 126.41 (6) (ar), 126.41 (6) (br) 4., 126.44 (1) (a) 1., 126.44 (1) (a) 2., 126.44 (1) (b) 1., 126.44 (1) (b) 2., 126.44 (1) (e), 126.47 (1) (ae), 126.47 (3) (ae), 126.47 (3) (c), 126.47 (5m) (title), 126.47 (5m) (a), 126.47 (5m) (b) (intro.), 126.47 (7) (ae), 126.485, 126.56 (2) (c), 126.70 (4) (gm), 126.70 (4) (L) and 126.73 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: various changes to the Agricultural Producer Security Program, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Various changes to the Agricultural Producer Security Program, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Ripp [R] | Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Rep. Ed Brooks [R] | Rep. Robert Brooks [R] |
Rep. Cody Horlacher [R] | Rep. Robert Kulp [R] | Rep. Scott Krug [R] | Rep. Lee Nerison [R] |
Rep. Gary Tauchen [R] | Rep. Paul Tittl [R] | Rep. Ron Tusler [R] | Rep. Nancy VanderMeer [R] |
Sen. Howard Marklein [R] | Sen. Luther Olsen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Agriculture, Small Business and Tourism |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-01-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-01-16 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2018-01-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-01-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-01-16 | House | Read a second time |
2018-01-11 | House | Placed on calendar 1-16-2018 by Committee on Rules |
2018-01-11 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-01-11 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2018-01-09 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-12-12 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-12-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-11-29 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2017-11-29 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab698 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB698.pdf |