WI AB698 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to: an addition to the 2009-11 Authorized State Building Program.
Title
An addition to the 2009-11 Authorized State Building Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Spencer Black [D] | Rep. Gordon Hintz [D] | Rep. Thomas Hixson [D] | Sen. Jeffrey Plale [D] |
Sen. Fred Risser [D] | Sen. Judith Robson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-07 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-04-07 | Report concurrence recommended by committee on Ethics Reform and Government Operations, Ayes 4, Noes 1 | |
2010-04-06 | Executive action taken | |
2010-03-17 | Public hearing held | |
2010-03-08 | Read first time and referred to committee on Ethics Reform and Government Operations | |
2010-03-05 | Received from Assembly | |
2010-03-04 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-03-04 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 53, Noes 41 | |
2010-03-04 | Rules suspended | |
2010-03-04 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-03-04 | Read a second time | |
2010-03-02 | Placed on calendar 3-4-2010 by committee on Rules | |
2010-03-02 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-03-02 | Report passage recommended by committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 8, Noes 4 | |
2010-03-02 | Executive action taken | |
2010-02-24 | Public hearing held | |
2010-02-22 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-02-11 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-02-01 | Read first time and referred to committee on Colleges and Universities | |
2010-02-01 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab698 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB698.pdf |