WI AB697 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 49.471 (11) (m); and to create 20.435 (4) (hm), 49.471 (11) (s), 49.67, 227.01 (13) (ur) and 227.42 (7) of the statutes; relating to: the BadgerCare Plus Basic Plan, Benchmark Plan benefits, and making an appropriation.
Title
The BadgerCare Plus Basic Plan, Benchmark Plan benefits, and making an appropriation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-02 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-04-02 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Health and Healthcare Reform, Ayes 8, Noes 4 | |
2010-04-02 | Report Assembly Amendment 6 adoption recommended by committee on Health and Healthcare Reform, Ayes 12, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-02 | Report Assembly Amendment 5 adoption recommended by committee on Health and Healthcare Reform, Ayes 12, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-02 | Report Assembly Amendment 4 adoption recommended by committee on Health and Healthcare Reform, Ayes 12, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-02 | Report Assembly Amendment 3 adoption recommended by committee on Health and Healthcare Reform, Ayes 12, Noes 0 | |
2010-03-31 | Executive action taken | |
2010-03-30 | Assembly amendment 7 offered by Representative Nygren | |
2010-03-29 | Assembly amendment 6 offered by Representatives Shilling and Bernard Schaber | |
2010-03-29 | Assembly amendment 5 offered by Representative Richards | |
2010-03-26 | Assembly amendment 4 offered by Representative Richards | |
2010-03-26 | Assembly amendment 3 offered by Representative Richards | |
2010-03-05 | Assembly amendment 2 offered by Representative Rhoades | |
2010-03-04 | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representatives Rhoades, Strachota, Nygren, Stone and Vukmir | |
2010-02-16 | Senator Jauch added as a cosponsor | |
2010-02-10 | Public hearing held | |
2010-02-05 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-02-01 | Read first time and referred to committee on Health and Healthcare Reform | |
2010-02-01 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab697 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB697.pdf |