WI AB695 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Published 3-31-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Published 3-31-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 155.30 (3) (form) and 244.61 (form); and to create 54.20 (2) (m), 112.12, 155.20 (9), 244.41 (1) (i), 244.43 (9m) and 701.0816 (28) of the statutes; Relating to: creating the Revised Uniform Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act.
Title
Creating the Revised Uniform Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Brooks [R] | Sen. Melissa Agard [D] | Rep. Robb Kahl [D] | Rep. Jesse Kremer [R] |
Rep. Evan Goyke [D] | Rep. Bob Gannon [R] | Rep. Sondy Pope [D] | Rep. Debra Kolste [D] |
Sen. Rob Hutton [R] | Rep. Christine Sinicki [D] | Rep. David Murphy [R] | Rep. Eric Genrich [D] |
Sen. Roger Roth [R] | Sen. Fred Risser [D] | Sen. Luther Olsen [R] | Sen. Mark Miller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | Published 3-31-2016 |
2016-03-31 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-30-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 300 |
2016-03-29 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-29-2016 |
2016-03-24 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-24-2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-15-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions, and Rural Issues and rereferred to committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions, and Rural Issues |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2016-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-18 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2016-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2016-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-16 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:28 PM on 2-18-2016 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2016-02-16 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-16 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2016-02-16 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2016-02-16 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2016-02-11 | House | Executive action taken |
2016-02-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Sargent and R. Brooks |
2016-02-04 | House | Representative Wachs added as a coauthor |
2016-02-04 | House | Public hearing held |
2016-02-02 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Sargent and R. Brooks |
2016-01-13 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-01-13 | House | Introduced |