WI AB693 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 115.38 (1) (b) 2., 118.125 (3), 118.164 (3) (a) 4. and 118.21 (1); to amend 118.125 (1) (a), 118.125 (3) (title), 118.127, 118.60 (7) (b) 7. b., 119.23 (7) (b) 7. b., 120.13 (1) (b) 2. (intro.), 120.13 (1) (b) 4., 938.396 (1) (a), 938.396 (1) (c) 3. (intro.), 938.396 (1) (c) 3. a., 938.396 (1) (c) 3. c., 938.396 (1) (c) 3. d., 938.396 (1) (c) 4. and 938.396 (1) (d); and to create 115.28 (54t), 118.125 (1) (bc), 118.125 (1m), 118.125 (2) (dm), 118.125 (3) (b) 2., 118.1255, 118.129, 118.164 (3) (am) 1., 118.164 (3) (am) 2., 118.164 (3) (am) 3., 118.21 (1) (b), 118.40 (4) (ar) 3., 118.60 (1) (ae), 118.60 (7) (b) 4m., 118.60 (7) (b) 5m., 118.60 (7) (b) 7m., 119.16 (16), 119.23 (1) (aem), 119.23 (7) (b) 4m., 119.23 (7) (b) 5m., 119.23 (7) (b) 7m., 120.12 (24m), 120.12 (29), 120.13 (1) (a) 5. and 938.396 (1) (cm) of the statutes; Relating to: rights of and protections for teachers. (FE)
Title
Rights of and protections for teachers. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 58 N: 36 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Education |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-22 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 58, Noes 36 |
2018-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-22 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adopted |
2018-02-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 60, Noes 34 |
2018-02-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Pope |
2018-02-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adopted |
2018-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-20 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:09 PM on 2-22-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 27 |
2018-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Thiesfeldt |
2018-02-20 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-20 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2018-02-20 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2018-02-20 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-02-14 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Thiesfeldt |
2018-02-08 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Thiesfeldt |
2018-01-11 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-12-21 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-11-29 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-11-29 | House | Introduced |