WI AB692 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 118.019 (1m) (a), 118.019 (1m) (b), 118.019 (2m) and 118.07 (5); to amend 118.019 (2) (intro.), 118.019 (3), 118.019 (4), 118.46 (1) (intro.) and 118.46 (1) (a) (intro.); and to create 118.019 (1m) (ag), 118.019 (1m) (c), (d), (e), (f), (g), (i), (j), (k), (L) and (m), 118.019 (2m) (b), 118.019 (2t), 118.07 (5) (b) and 121.02 (1) (L) 2m. of the statutes; Relating to: teen dating violence policies and education. (FE)
Title
Teen dating violence policies and education. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-09 | House | Representative T. Larson withdrawn as a coauthor |
2016-02-05 | House | Representatives Kulp and Rohrkaste withdrawn as coauthors |
2016-02-04 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Spiros and Sargent |
2016-01-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-26 | House | Withdrawn from committee on Education and referred to committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c) |
2016-01-13 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2016-01-13 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab692 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB692.pdf |