WI AB69 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 118.07 (6) of the statutes; Relating to: reporting to law enforcement certain crimes and other incidents that occur in or on public school buildings and grounds, requiring certain schools to employ armed school resource officers, and allocating federal American Rescue Plan Act of 2021 funding to reimburse schools for costs of employing armed school resource officers. (FE)
Title
Reporting to law enforcement certain crimes and other incidents that occur in or on public school buildings and grounds, requiring certain schools to employ armed school resource officers, and allocating federal American Rescue Plan Act of 2021 funding to reimburse schools for costs of employing armed school resource officers. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-14 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Representative Knodl added as a coauthor |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2023-03-14 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-03-14 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 59, Noes 36 |
2023-03-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-03-14 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-03-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2023-03-14 | House | Read a second time |
2023-03-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Rettinger |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on calendar 3-14-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-03-08 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2023-03-08 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 9, Noes 5 |
2023-03-08 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-03-07 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-03-07 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-03-02 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-02-27 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2023-02-27 | House | Introduced |