WI AB69 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 111.335 (3) (a); to renumber and amend 973.015 (1m) (a) 1.; to amend 111.335 (4) (b), 111.335 (4) (c) 1. (intro.), 111.335 (4) (e), 111.335 (4) (f) 1., 950.04 (1v) (g), 973.015 (1m) (b) and 973.25 (1) (a); and to create 111.335 (3) (ag), 111.335 (3) (g), 973.015 (1b), 973.015 (1m) (a) 1. a. and b., 973.015 (1m) (a) 3. c. and d. and 4., 973.015 (1m) (c) and 973.015 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: expungement of records of certain crimes and discrimination based on expunged conviction. (FE)
Title
Expungement of records of certain crimes and discrimination based on expunged conviction. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-10-19 | Senate | LRB correction |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2021-06-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-06-16 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2021-06-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-06-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-06-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2021-06-16 | House | Read a second time |
2021-06-15 | House | Representative Ramthun withdrawn as a coauthor |
2021-06-09 | House | Placed on calendar 6-16-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-06-08 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-06-08 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2021-06-08 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 8, Noes 6 |
2021-05-27 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-05-25 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Horlacher |
2021-05-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-10 | House | Representative Hong added as a coauthor |
2021-04-07 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-04-06 | House | Representatives Stubbs and Novak added as coauthors |
2021-03-24 | House | Representative Conley added as a coauthor |
2021-03-23 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-03-19 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-03-09 | House | Representative Callahan added as a coauthor |
2021-03-02 | House | Representative Ramthun added as a coauthor |
2021-03-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-02-26 | House | Representative McGuire added as a coauthor |
2021-02-18 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduced |