WI AB69 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 43-19)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 43-19)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 450.135 of the statutes; Relating to: access to investigational drugs, devices, and biological products and limitations on liability related to their use.
Title
Access to investigational drugs, devices, and biological products and limitations on liability related to their use.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 6 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 5 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 4 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 65 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 6 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 5 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 4 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 65 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-08-16 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Health and Human Services |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2017-03-07 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-03-07 | House | Representatives Thiesfeldt, Petryk, Petersen, Summerfield, Ott, Kitchens, Macco, Rohrkaste and Duchow added as coauthors |
2017-03-07 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 85, Noes 13 |
2017-03-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-03-07 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2017-03-07 | House | Assembly Amendment 6 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 64, Noes 34 |
2017-03-07 | House | Assembly Amendment 6 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Riemer |
2017-03-07 | House | Assembly Amendment 5 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 64, Noes 34 |
2017-03-07 | House | Assembly Amendment 5 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Shankland |
2017-03-07 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 65, Noes 33 |
2017-03-07 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Subeck, Sargent and Spreitzer |
2017-03-07 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 64, Noes 34 |
2017-03-07 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Shankland, Hesselbein, Barca, Doyle and Spreitzer |
2017-03-07 | House | Read a second time |
2017-03-03 | House | Representative Zamarripa withdrawn as a coauthor |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on calendar 3-7-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-03-01 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 10, Noes 2 |
2017-03-01 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 10, Noes 2 |
2017-03-01 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-03-01 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Subeck, Kolste, C. Taylor and Zamarripa |
2017-03-01 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Kolste, Subeck, C. Taylor and Zamarripa |
2017-02-28 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Snyder |
2017-02-28 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Subeck, Kolste, C. Taylor and Zamarripa |
2017-02-28 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Kolste, Subeck, C. Taylor and Zamarripa |
2017-02-28 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Kolste, Subeck, C. Taylor and Zamarripa |
2017-02-22 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-02-13 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2017-02-13 | House | Introduced |