WI AB687 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Published 3-1-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Published 3-1-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: revising various provisions of the statutes to eliminate defects, anachronisms, and obsolete provisions (Revision Bill).
Title
Revising various provisions of the statutes to eliminate defects, anachronisms, and obsolete provisions (Revision Bill).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | House | Published 3-1-2016 |
2016-03-01 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 2-29-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 196 |
2016-02-25 | House | Presented to the Governor on 2-25-2016 |
2016-02-23 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-23-2016 |
2016-02-10 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-9-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2016-01-19 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-01-19 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2016-01-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-01-19 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-01-19 | House | Read a second time |
2016-01-19 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2016-01-14 | House | Placed on calendar 1-19-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2016-01-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Rules |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |