WI AB685 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 703.245 of the statutes; Relating to: creating a pre-filing notice requirement applicable to a dispute between a condominium association and a unit owner.
Title
Creating a pre-filing notice requirement applicable to a dispute between a condominium association and a unit owner.
Sponsors
Rep. Joel Kitchens [R] | Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Rep. Beth Meyers [D] | Sen. Robert Cowles [R] |
Sen. Luther Olsen [R] | Sen. Jerry Petrowski [R] | Sen. David Hansen [D] | Sen. Lena Taylor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-26 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-03-26 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2020-03-26 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2020-02-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-01-27 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kitchens |
2020-01-16 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-12-20 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing and Real Estate |
2019-12-20 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab685 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB685.pdf |