WI AB683 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 66.0615 (1) (bs), 66.0615 (1) (de) and 66.0615 (5); to renumber and amend 59.25 (3) (e); to amend 66.0615 (1) (dk), 66.0615 (1m) (a), 66.0615 (1m) (g), 66.0615 (2) (intro.), 66.0615 (2) (a), 66.0615 (2) (b), 66.0615 (4) (a) (intro.) and 66.1014 (2) (d) 1.; and to create 59.25 (3) (e) 1., 59.25 (3) (e) 2., 66.0615 (1) (bt), 66.0615 (1r), 66.0615 (2) (f), 66.0615 (2m), 66.0615 (4) (a) 4., 66.0615 (4) (d) and 66.1014 (1) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: expanding applicability of the room tax, making substantive and technical changes to the local room tax, and providing a penalty. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanding applicability of the room tax, making substantive and technical changes to the local room tax, and providing a penalty. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-01SenateFailed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2020-03-11SenateAvailable for scheduling
2020-03-11SenateReport concurrence recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 9, Noes 0
2020-03-11SenateExecutive action taken
2020-02-28SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions
2020-02-21SenateReceived from Assembly
2020-02-20HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-20HouseRead a third time and passed
2020-02-20HouseRules suspended
2020-02-20HouseOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-20HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 2 adopted
2020-02-20HouseRead a second time
2020-02-18HouseMade a special order of business at 10:33 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21
2020-02-18HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2020-02-18HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 11, Noes 0
2020-02-18HouseReport Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 11, Noes 0
2020-02-18HouseExecutive action taken
2020-02-17HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Kitchens
2020-02-11HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kitchens
2020-01-17HouseFiscal estimate received
2020-01-09HousePublic hearing held
2019-12-20HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-12-20HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback