WI AB68 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Representatives Sapik and Dittrich added as coauthors
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Representatives Sapik and Dittrich added as coauthors
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 940.02 (2) (intro.) of the statutes; Relating to: first-degree reckless homicide and providing a penalty.
Title
First-degree reckless homicide and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | House | Representatives Sapik and Dittrich added as coauthors |
2023-06-01 | House | Representative Stubbs added as a coauthor |
2023-03-24 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2023-03-24 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 13, Noes 2 |
2023-03-07 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-02-28 | House | Representatives Wichgers and O'Connor added as coauthors |
2023-02-28 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-02-23 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2023-02-23 | House | Introduced |