WI AB677 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 939.632 (title), 939.632 (2) (intro.) and 939.632 (4); and to create 939.632 (1) (dm) and 939.632 (3m) of the statutes; relating to: sentencing for crimes on school premises and providing a penalty.
Title
Sentencing for crimes on school premises and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Alberta Darling [R] | Rep. Jason Fields [D] | Rep. Keith Ripp [R] | Rep. Tony Staskunas [D] |
Rep. John Steinbrink [D] | Rep. Robert Turner [D] | Rep. Josh Zepnick [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-02-15 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-02-10 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-02-08 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-01-25 | Report of joint review committee on Criminal Penalties requested pursuant to s. 13.525 (5) Wisconsin Statutes | |
2010-01-22 | Read first time and referred to committee on Education | |
2010-01-22 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab677 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB677.pdf |