WI AB673 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 27.01 (7) (c) 11., 27.01 (8) (bn) 1., 29.164 (3m) (am), 29.193 (3) (c) and 29.236 (1) of the statutes; Relating to: the disability rating at which veterans qualify for certain hunting and fishing authorizations and exemptions from state park and trail admission fees. (FE)
Title
The disability rating at which veterans qualify for certain hunting and fishing authorizations and exemptions from state park and trail admission fees. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-30 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-01-29 | House | Representative Edming added as a coauthor |
2020-01-27 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-12-13 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage |
2019-12-13 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab673 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB673.pdf |