WI AB673 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 6.47 (4); to amend 6.47 (2); and to create 6.47 (1) (am) 5., 6.47 (4) (b), 19.35 (1) (am) 2m., 66.0504 and 165.68 of the statutes; Relating to: creating a program to protect the confidentiality of addresses for victims of domestic abuse, sexual assault, or stalking; providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures; and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Creating a program to protect the confidentiality of addresses for victims of domestic abuse, sexual assault, or stalking; providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures; and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-02-08 | House | Representative Meyers added as a coauthor |
2016-02-04 | House | Placed on calendar 2-9-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2016-02-04 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-04 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2016-02-04 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2016-02-04 | House | Executive action taken |
2016-02-01 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-28 | House | Public hearing held |
2016-01-28 | House | Representative Wachs added as a coauthor |
2016-01-21 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kleefisch |
2016-01-13 | House | Representative Loudenbeck added as a coauthor |
2016-01-11 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-01-11 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab673 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB673.pdf |