WI AB670 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-6)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Published 4-9-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-6)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Published 4-9-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 350.12 (3) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: the registration of antique snowmobiles. (FE)
Title
The registration of antique snowmobiles. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Published 4-9-2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-8-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 233 |
2014-04-07 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-7-2014 |
2014-04-03 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 4-3-2014 |
2014-04-02 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-1-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2014-03-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-18 | House | Representatives Vruwink and Barca added as coauthors |
2014-03-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2014-03-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-03-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-18 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2014-03-18 | House | Read a second time |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on calendar 3-18-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-03-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-03-07 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2014-03-07 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2014-02-27 | House | Executive action taken |
2014-02-12 | House | Public hearing held |
2014-02-11 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Williams and Loudenbeck |
2014-02-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-01-28 | House | Senator Kedzie added as a cosponsor |
2014-01-24 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage |
2014-01-24 | House | Introduced |