WI AB666 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 944.17 (2) (a), 944.17 (2) (c) and 944.17 (2) (d); to renumber and amend 944.17 (2) (intro.); to amend 301.45 (1d) (b), 440.312 (2), 440.982 (2), 460.05 (1) (h) 1. and 460.14 (2m) (a); and to create 948.015 (10), 951.085 and 951.14 (2j) of the statutes; Relating to: sexual contact with an animal and providing a criminal penalty.
Title
Sexual contact with an animal and providing a criminal penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Andre Jacque [R] | Rep. Jesse Kremer [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] | Sen. Melissa Agard [D] |
Rep. Lisa Subeck [D] | Rep. Paul Tittl [R] | Rep. Ron Tusler [R] | Rep. Chuck Wichgers [R] |
Sen. Fred Risser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-02-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-15 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2018-02-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-15 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-13 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:04 PM on 2-15-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23 |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-13 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2018-02-07 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-01-29 | House | LRB correction |
2018-01-26 | House | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor |
2018-01-25 | House | Public hearing held |
2018-01-23 | House | Senator L. Taylor added as a cosponsor |
2017-11-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2017-11-22 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab666 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB666.pdf |