WI AB665 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 185.981 (4t) and 185.983 (1) (intro.); and to create 609.71 and 632.723 of the statutes; relating to: requiring an insurer to make payment directly to a provider who provides the insurer with an assignment of benefits.
Title
Requiring an insurer to make payment directly to a provider who provides the insurer with an assignment of benefits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-01-26 | Representative Gunderson withdrawn as a coauthor | |
2010-01-25 | Senator Jauch withdrawn as a cosponsor | |
2010-01-22 | Read first time and referred to committee on Public Health | |
2010-01-22 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab665 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB665.pdf |