WI AB66 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 125.32 (8) and 125.68 (13) of the statutes; relating to: pricing of retail sales of alcohol beverages.
Title
Pricing of retail sales of alcohol beverages.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-03-29 | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Zepnick | |
2009-08-25 | Public hearing held | |
2009-02-17 | Read first time and referred to committee on Urban and Local Affairs | |
2009-02-17 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab66 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB66.pdf |