WI AB657 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 342.06 (1) (j) of the statutes; Relating to: disclosure of mileage when titling a motor vehicle. (FE)
Title
Disclosure of mileage when titling a motor vehicle. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 8:39 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-01 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2021-12-14 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-11-17 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-11-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-10-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-10-25 | House | Introduced |