WI AB655 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 440.9715 (title); to renumber 440.9715 (1) and 440.9715 (3); to renumber and amend 440.9712 (1), 440.9715 (intro.) and 440.9715 (2); to amend 440.9712 (title), 440.9712 (1m), 440.9712 (2), 440.972 (title) and (1) (intro.), (a) and (c), 440.972 (2), 440.973 (1), 440.973 (2), 440.973 (3), 440.974 (1) (a), 440.974 (2), 440.975 (3) (cm), 440.978 (2) (intro.), (a) and (c), 440.978 (4) (intro.), 440.978 (5) (intro.) and 440.979 (1); and to create 440.972 (1) (bg) and (br), 440.972 (1m), 440.974 (1) (ag) and (ar), 440.975 (3) (bm) and 440.975 (3) (cr) of the statutes; Relating to: regulation of home inspectors, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Regulation of home inspectors, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Utilities and Housing, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-03-10 | Senate | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1) |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Printed engrossed by the direction of the Senate Chief Clerk-5804 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Utilities and Housing |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2020-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-19 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Brooks |
2020-02-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:26 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2020-02-18 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2020-02-18 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2020-02-17 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Brooks |
2020-02-13 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-02-11 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Stuck and Brooks |
2020-02-10 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Brooks |
2020-02-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Stuck and Brooks |
2020-01-30 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-01-28 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Brooks |
2019-12-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-12-05 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform |
2019-12-05 | House | Introduced |