WI AB650 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 165.25 (10) of the statutes; Relating to: reports on restitution to crime victims.
Title
Reports on restitution to crime victims.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Novak [R] | Rep. Mark Born [R] | Rep. Ed Brooks [R] | Rep. Cindi Duchow [R] |
Rep. Cody Horlacher [R] | Rep. Joel Kitchens [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] | Rep. Travis Tranel [R] |
Rep. Keith Ripp [R] | Rep. Ron Tusler [R] | Rep. David Bowen [D] | Sen. Luther Olsen [R] |
Sen. Howard Marklein [R] | Sen. Van Wanggaard [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Published 4-17-2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 337 |
2018-04-12 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-12-2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-27-2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-02-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-13 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2018-02-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-13 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on calendar 2-13-2018 by Committee on Rules |
2018-02-07 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-07 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2018-01-25 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-01-11 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-11-30 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-11-14 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2017-11-14 | House | Introduced |