WI AB65 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-9)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-9)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 134.66 (title), 134.66 (2) (a), 134.66 (2) (am), 134.66 (2) (b), 134.66 (2) (cm) 1m., 134.66 (2m) (a), 134.66 (3) (intro.), subchapter IX (title) of chapter 254 [precedes 254.911], 254.916 (2) (intro.), 254.92 (title), 254.92 (1), 254.92 (2), 254.92 (2m) (intro.) and 254.92 (3); and to create 134.66 (1) (jm) and 254.911 (11) of the statutes; Relating to: prohibiting the sale of vapor products to minors and the purchase of those products by minors. (FE)
Title
Prohibiting the sale of vapor products to minors and the purchase of those products by minors. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-07-03 | House | Senator Bewley added as a cosponsor |
2019-04-18 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab65 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB65.pdf |