WI AB644 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-5)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-5)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 61.66 (2) and 891.45 (2); and to create 891.453 of the statutes; relating to: establishing a presumption for employment-connected communicable diseases for fire fighters, emergency medical service providers, law enforcement officers, and certain correctional employees.
Title
Establishing a presumption for employment-connected communicable diseases for fire fighters, emergency medical service providers, law enforcement officers, and certain correctional employees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-15 | Laid on the table | |
2010-04-13 | Made a special order of business at 11:23 A.M. on 4-15-2010 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 22 | |
2010-02-09 | Report of joint survey committee on Retirement Systems requested pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (1)(am) | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-02-09 | Report passage recommended by committee on Labor, Ayes 9, Noes 0 | |
2010-01-27 | Executive action taken | |
2010-01-26 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-01-19 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-01-13 | Public hearing held | |
2010-01-05 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-01-04 | Read first time and referred to committee on Labor | |
2010-01-04 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab644 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB644.pdf |